NV SCR4 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Directs the Legislative Committee on Energy to conduct an interim study concerning the development of renewable energy resources in this State. (BDR R-1130)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the Legislative Committee on Energy to conduct an interim study concerning the development of renewable energy resources in this State. (BDR R-1130)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06Assembly(No further action taken.)
2017-05-22AssemblyResolution read. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
2017-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-22SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To Assembly.
2017-05-19SenateTo printer.
2017-05-19SenateResolution read and adopted, as amended.
2017-05-19SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2017-05-19SenateResolution read. Amended. (Amend. No. 638.)
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Resolution File.
2017-05-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended.
2017-03-22SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-20SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback