NV SCR14 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-25)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - File No. 35.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Memorializing former District Court Judge Don P. Chairez.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Memorializes former District Court Judge Don P. Chairez. (BDR R-1140)

Sponsors

Sen. Moises Denis [D]Sen. James Ohrenschall [D]Rep. Edgar Flores [D]Sen. Chris Brooks [D]
Sen. Carrie Buck [R]Sen. Nicole Cannizzaro [D]Sen. Fabian Donate [D]Sen. Marilyn Dondero Loop [D]
Sen. Pete Goicoechea [R]Sen. Scott Hammond [R]Sen. Ira Hansen [R]Sen. Joseph Hardy [R]
Sen. Dallas Harris [D]Sen. Ben Kieckhefer [R]Sen. Roberta Lange [D]Sen. Dina Neal [D]
Sen. Keith Pickard [R]Sen. Julia Ratti [D]Sen. Melanie Scheible [D]Sen. Heidi Gansert [R]
Sen. James Settelmeyer [R]Sen. Patricia Spearman [D]Rep. Natha Anderson [D]Rep. Teresa Benitez-Thompson [D]
Rep. Shannon Bilbray-Axelrod [D]Rep. Annie Black [R]Rep. Tracy Brown-May [D]Rep. Maggie Carlton [D]
Rep. Lesley Cohen [D]Rep. Venicia Considine [D]Rep. Jill Dickman [R]Rep. Bea Duran [D]
Rep. John Ellison [R]Rep. Jason Frierson [D]Rep. Cecelia Gonzalez [D]Rep. Michelle Gorelow [D]
Rep. Gregory Hafen [R]Rep. Alexis Hansen [R]Rep. Melissa Hardy [R]Rep. Sandra Jauregui [D]
Rep. Heidi Kasama [R]Rep. Lisa Krasner [R]Rep. Glen Leavitt [R]Rep. Susan Martinez [D]
Rep. Elaine Marzola [D]Rep. Andy Matthews [R]Rep. Richard McArthur [R]Rep. Brittney Miller [D]
Rep. Cameron Miller [D]Rep. Daniele Monroe-Moreno [D]Rep. Rochelle Nguyen [D]Rep. Philip O'Neill [R]
Rep. David Orentlicher [D]Rep. Sarah Peters [D]Rep. Thomas Roberts [R]Rep. Shondra Summers-Armstrong [D]
Rep. Clara Thomas [D]Rep. Robin Titus [R]Rep. Jill Tolles [R]Rep. Selena Torres [D]
Rep. Howard Watts [D]Rep. Jim Wheeler [R]Rep. Steve Yeager [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-27SenateFile No. 35.
2021-05-27SenateEnrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
2021-05-26SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2021-05-25AssemblyResolution read and adopted. To Senate.
2021-05-25AssemblyIn Assembly.
2021-05-25SenateTo Assembly.
2021-05-25SenateFrom printer.
2021-05-24SenateResolution read and adopted. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback