NV SB96 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 394.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 394.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to disability services; requiring the Department of Health and Human Services to biennially establish reimbursement rates for the services of certain providers for persons with autism spectrum disorders that are comparable to reimbursement rates paid by Medicaid programs in other states; requiring the Department to establish certain limitations relating to the provision of such services to recipients of Medicaid; providing for the reporting to the Legislature or the Legislative Committee on Health Care of certain information concerning the provision of such services to recipients of Medicaid; requiring the Autism Treatment Assistance Program to publish certain information on the Internet website of the Program and take certain actions when there is a waiting list for services from the Program; requiring the Department to seek an increase in certain reimbursement rates for a registered behavior technician under the Medicaid program, the Autism Treatment Assistance Program and the Children's Health Insurance Program; making appropriations; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes relating to services provided to persons with autism spectrum disorders. (BDR 38-89)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 394. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 853 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | To printer. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 853.) |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | To printer. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 745.) |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 177.) |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |