NV SB96 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public lands; creating the Nevada Public Lands Grant Program within the State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources; making an appropriation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates a grant program to award grants of money to certain organizations applying for federal funds to finance certain projects related to public lands. (BDR 26-510)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Senate(No further action taken.)
2019-04-16SenateExemption effective.
2019-04-16SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2019-04-15SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2019-04-15SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 176.)
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-15SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-25SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-02-04SenateRead first time. To committee.
2019-01-25SenateFrom printer.
2019-01-24SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback