NV SB94 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-15 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-15 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to elections. (BDR 24-19)
Title
Revises provisions relating to elections. (BDR 24-19)
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Ford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-15 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | From printer. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/history.cfm?ID=200 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB94.pdf |