NV SB94 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 232.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Makes various changes relating to transferable tax credits for film and other productions. (BDR 32-58)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes relating to transferable tax credits for film and other productions. (BDR 32-58)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-27SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 232.
2015-05-22SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-21SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2015-05-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 7, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2015-05-19AssemblyRead second time.
2015-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-04-16AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.
2015-04-16AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-04-15SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2015-04-15SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-04-14SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 434.) To printer.
2015-04-14SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-04-14SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-02-02SenateRead first time. To committee.
2015-02-01SenateFrom printer.
2015-01-30SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback