NV SB94 | 2013 | 77th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 322.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions governing certain loans. (BDR 52-581)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing certain loans. (BDR 52-581)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-01SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 322.
2013-05-31SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2013-05-29SenateAssembly Amendment No. 644 concurred in. To enrollment.
2013-05-24SenateIn Senate.
2013-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 6, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2013-05-22AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2013-05-21AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2013-05-21AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2013-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 644.) To printer.
2013-05-20AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2013-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2013-04-23AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2013-04-23AssemblyIn Assembly.
2013-04-22SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.) To Assembly.
2013-04-19SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2013-04-18SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2013-04-18SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2013-04-17SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 325.) To printer.
2013-04-16SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2013-02-08SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2013-02-07SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback