NV SB92 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - Chapter 228.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - Chapter 228.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to sidewalk vendors; establishing certain requirements for the regulation of sidewalk vendors by the governing body of certain counties and cities; requiring a local board of health to adopt certain regulations relating to sidewalk vendors who sell food; creating the Task Force on Safe Sidewalk Vending; setting forth the membership and duties of the Task Force on Safe Sidewalk Vending; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to sidewalk vendors. (BDR 20-53)
Sponsors
Sen. Fabian Donate [D] | Sen. Edgar Flores [D] | Sen. James Ohrenschall [D] | Rep. Elaine Marzola [D] |
Rep. Cecelia Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Selena Torres [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-08 | Senate | Chapter 228. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Assembly Amendment Nos. 624 and 720 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2023-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 720.) To printer. |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 624.) To printer. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 473.) To printer. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | From printer. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |