NV SB92 | 2009 | 75th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-09 - Chapter 499.

Summary

Makes various changes relating to the regulation of notaries public. (BDR 19-414)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes relating to the regulation of notaries public. (BDR 19-414)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-06-09 Chapter 499.
2009-05-29 Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
2009-05-28 Assembly Amendment No. 735 concurred in. To enrollment.
2009-05-21 In Senate.
2009-05-20 Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 2.) To Senate.
2009-05-20 From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2009-05-19 Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 735.) To printer.
2009-05-19 Placed on Second Reading File.
2009-05-19 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2009-04-09 Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2009-04-09 In Assembly.
2009-04-08 Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2009-04-07 From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2009-04-06 Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 10.) To printer.
2009-04-02 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2009-02-02 Read first time. To committee.
2008-12-17 From printer.
2008-12-15 Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback