NV SB90 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 504.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the health of children; revising requirements relating to the testing of children for lead; establishing the Diapering Resources Account and providing for the distribution of money from the Account to provide diapers and diapering supplies to low-income families; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes relating to the health of children. (BDR 40-448)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10SenateChapter 504.
2019-06-07SenateApproved by the Governor.
2019-06-06SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-06-03SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-06-02AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2019-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-06-01AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
2019-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-06-01SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly.
2019-06-01SenateTo printer.
2019-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
2019-06-01SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2019-06-01SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1057.)
2019-06-01SenatePlaced on General File.
2019-06-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-23SenateExemption effective.
2019-04-23SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2019-04-22SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2019-04-22SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 87.)
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-24SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-02-04SenateRead first time. To committee.
2019-01-25SenateFrom printer.
2019-01-24SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback