NV SB88 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 503.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to insurance; revising provisions relating to licenses, certificates, permits and other authorizations for producers of insurance and other persons regulated by the Commissioner of Insurance; revising certain educational requirements for persons regulated by the Commissioner of Insurance; revising certain licensing and other fees; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing producers of insurance and other persons regulated by the Commissioner of Insurance. (BDR 57-220)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10SenateChapter 503.
2019-06-07SenateApproved by the Governor.
2019-06-06SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-06-03SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-06-02AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2019-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-05-15AssemblyRereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee.
2019-05-15AssemblyTaken from General File.
2019-05-15AssemblyRead second time.
2019-05-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-19AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2019-04-19AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-18SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-04-18SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-17SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 8.) To printer.
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-25SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-02-04SenateRead first time. To committee.
2018-11-26SenateFrom printer.
2018-11-21SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback