NV SB87 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 201.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to insurance; deeming benefits established by a long-term care rider to a life insurance policy or annuity contract to be the same type of benefits as provided in a basic policy or contract for certain purposes; clarifying the policies and contracts for which the Nevada Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association is required to provide coverage; requiring a health maintenance organization to be a member of the Association; revising the composition of the Board of Directors of the Association; prescribing the manner in which the Association must calculate and allocate certain assessments; authorizing certain member insurers to recoup assessments; revising certain terminology; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing the Nevada Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association. (BDR 57-219)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30SenateChapter 201.
2019-05-29SenateApproved by the Governor.
2019-05-28SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-22AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-21AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2019-04-18AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-17SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-04-17SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-16SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 5.) To printer.
2019-04-16SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-16SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-04SenateRead first time. To committee.
2018-11-26SenateFrom printer.
2018-11-21SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback