NV SB85 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 74.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 74.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to animals; making it unlawful for a person or any agent or employee of a person to knowingly bring into or knowingly possess in this State the carcass or any part of the carcass of any elk, mule deer, white-tailed deer, moose, alternative livestock or certain other animals; prohibiting a person or the person's agent or employee from knowingly bringing any live moose or alternative livestock into this State; providing exceptions; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing the importation into this State of certain live animals or parts of the carcass of certain animals. (BDR 45-206)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 74. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 11, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee. |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 113.) To printer. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-26 | Senate | From printer. |
2018-11-20 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |