NV SB84 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 310.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 310.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Includes certain alcohol and drug abuse counselors, problem gambling counselors, social workers and medical facilities in the definition of provider of health care for purposes of various provisions relating to healing arts and certain other provisions. (BDR 54-389)
Title
Includes certain alcohol and drug abuse counselors, problem gambling counselors, social workers and medical facilities in the definition of provider of health care for purposes of various provisions relating to healing arts and certain other provisions. (BDR 54-389)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-01 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 310. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 725 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 9.) To Senate. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 725.) To printer. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-04-01 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2015-04-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 13.) To printer. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2014-12-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2014-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer. |