NV SB83 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; authorizing the Department of Education to temporarily waive or pause certain requirements related to the statewide system of accountability for public schools and certain examinations or assessments if the United States Department of Education has waived or paused similar requirements of federal law; providing certain exceptions to provisions that require the use of the statewide system of accountability or results of an examination or assessment; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to certain ratings and assessments. (BDR 34-527)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 5. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | To enrollment. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 21 concurred in. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 2, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 21.) To printer. |
2021-03-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1.) To printer. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | From printer. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |