NV SB82 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 158.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 158.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Charter of the City of Sparks; revising provisions relating to when the name of a candidate must appear on the ballot at a primary or general election; clarifying the date on which an elected officer enters office; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes changes to various provisions of the Charter of the City of Sparks. (BDR S-489)
Sponsors
Sen. Julia Ratti [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Senate | Chapter 158. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Not voting: 1.) To Senate. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | From printer. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |