NV SB81 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 118.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 118.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to tobacco products; revising provisions governing the licensing of persons engaged in the manufacturing, distribution and sale of tobacco products; requiring wholesale dealers of other tobacco products to keep on hand at all times a certain inventory of other tobacco products; establishing procedures to claim a refund for any amount, penalty or interest erroneously paid in connection with taxes on tobacco products; revising provisions governing the possession, transfer and sale of cigarettes and the reports filed by wholesale dealers of cigarettes; revising provisions governing revenue stamps; requiring manufacturers and retail dealers of cigarettes to maintain certain information on file with the Department of Taxation; revising requirements for wholesale dealers of cigarettes and distributors to report certain information to the Department; revising civil penalties imposed for certain violations of law governing tobacco products; revising provisions governing the imposition and payment of the tax on other tobacco products; revising requirements for wholesale dealers and retail dealers of other tobacco products to retain certain records; revising provisions governing changes to the directory of cigarette manufacturers and brand families maintained by the Department; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises various provisions relating to tobacco products. (BDR 32-190)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Chapter 118. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 12, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 591.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-26 | Senate | From printer. |
2018-11-20 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer. |