NV SB79 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; requiring the Department of Education to prescribe by regulation a policy for all school districts and public schools to manage chronic absenteeism; requiring the board of trustees of a school district or the governing body of a charter school to adopt the policy prescribed by the Department, at a minimum, and provide for the training of certain persons in accordance with the adopted policy; requiring an advisory board to review school attendance to evaluate the effectiveness of the policy to manage chronic absenteeism adopted by the board of trustees of the school district or the governing body of a charter school in the county; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Requires the adoption of certain policies regarding chronic absenteeism for pupils enrolled in public schools in this State. (BDR 34-332)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-13 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-26 | Senate | From printer. |
2018-11-20 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/6021/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/SB/SB79.pdf |