NV SB75 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 279.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 279.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to unemployment compensation; revising provisions relating to personnel of the Employment Security Division of the Department of Employment, Training and Rehabilitation; revising requirements relating to the confidentiality of information concerning unemployment compensation; authorizing an extended benefit period to begin before the 14th week following the end of a prior extended benefit period under certain circumstances; revising provisions governing the electronic transmission of certain communications related to unemployment compensation; revising provisions relating to eligibility for unemployment benefits under certain circumstances; revising provisions relating to the judicial review of a decision of the Board of Review; revising requirements for the payment of certain refunds and adjustments; modifying certain requirements concerning unemployment benefits paid during certain periods of time; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to unemployment compensation. (BDR 53-349)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 279. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 628 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | To printer. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 14, Absent: 1.) |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 628.) |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 104.) To printer. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2020-12-15 | Senate | From printer. |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |