NV SB73 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to taxation; authorizing the City Council of the City of Reno to adopt a resolution establishing the formation of a committee to recommend the imposition of certain taxes or reallocation of certain tax revenue to fund certain natural resources projects and services in the City of Reno; providing that if such a committee is formed and submits its recommendations to the City Council of the City of Reno within the time prescribed, the City Council of the City of Reno is required to submit a question to the voters of the City of Reno at the 2022 General Election asking whether the recommended taxes should be imposed or the recommended tax revenue reallocated, or both; requiring the City Council of the City of Reno to adopt an ordinance imposing any such taxes or reallocating any such tax revenue approved by the voters; providing for the use of the proceeds of such taxes and tax revenue for such natural resources projects and services; providing for the prospective expiration of the authority to establish such a committee; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows the imposition of certain taxes or the reallocation of certain tax revenue to fund certain natural resources projects and services in the City of Reno based on the recommendations of a committee and voter approval. (BDR S-432)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-10Senate(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
2021-02-01SenateRead first time. To committee.
2020-12-15SenateFrom printer.
2020-11-18SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback