NV SB72 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 204.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 204.
Summary
Authorizes a registered pharmacist or a registered intern pharmacist to perform certain screening tests. (BDR 54-376)
Title
Authorizes a registered pharmacist or a registered intern pharmacist to perform certain screening tests. (BDR 54-376)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 204. | |
2009-05-20 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-19 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-16 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-16 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-16 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-21 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. | |
2009-04-21 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-20 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-20 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-04-20 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 461.) To printer. | |
2009-04-20 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-20 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-12-17 | From printer. | |
2008-12-15 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=152 |