NV SB66 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 596.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to work-based learning programs. (BDR 34-254)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to work-based learning programs. (BDR 34-254)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 596.
2017-06-05SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-03SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-06-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 4, Excused: 4.) To Senate.
2017-06-02AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-01AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-31AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-30AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-30AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-05-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-05-26AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
2017-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
2017-05-25SenateTo printer.
2017-05-25SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
2017-05-25SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2017-05-25SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 918.)
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on General File.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-21SenateExemption effective.
2017-04-21SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-20SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2017-04-20SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 14.)
2017-04-20SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-04-20SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-02-06SenateRead first time. To committee.
2016-11-23SenateFrom printer.
2016-11-17SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback