NV SB66 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 177.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 177.
Summary
Revises certain provisions governing the appropriation of water. (BDR 48-618)
Title
Revises certain provisions governing the appropriation of water. (BDR 48-618)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 177. | |
2009-05-19 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-18 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-16 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-15 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-13 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-13 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | |
2009-04-16 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-15 | To Assembly. | |
2009-04-15 | (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Not voting: 1.) | |
2009-04-15 | Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. | |
2009-04-15 | Action of passage rescinded. | |
2009-04-15 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) | |
2009-04-15 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-04-14 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 243.) To printer. | |
2009-04-14 | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. | |
2009-04-08 | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. | |
2009-04-07 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-06 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 34.) To printer. | |
2009-04-02 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-12-10 | From printer. | |
2008-12-09 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=128 |