NV SB63 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 254.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 254.
Summary
Makes various changes concerning public financial administration. (BDR 31-493)
Title
Makes various changes concerning public financial administration. (BDR 31-493)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-28 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 254. | |
2009-05-22 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-21 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-20 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-05-20 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-13 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-05-13 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-13 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-02-25 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | |
2009-02-25 | In Assembly. | |
2009-02-24 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-02-23 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-02-20 | Read second time. | |
2009-02-19 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-12-10 | From printer. | |
2008-12-09 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=125 |