NV SB61 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-18 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 82.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-18 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 82.
Summary
Revises provisions governing the authorized uses of money in a school district mitigation fund. (BDR 32-504)
Title
Revises provisions governing the authorized uses of money in a school district mitigation fund. (BDR 32-504)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-18 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 82. | |
2009-05-17 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-15 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-12 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-08 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-08 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-08 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee. | |
2009-04-16 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-15 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-14 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-13 | Read second time. | |
2009-04-08 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-12-08 | From printer. | |
2008-12-07 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=122 |