NV SB60 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 504.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises various provisions related to the Office of the Attorney General. (BDR 16-470)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises various provisions related to the Office of the Attorney General. (BDR 16-470)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-10SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 504.
2015-06-01SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-30SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2015-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2015-05-28AssemblyRead second time.
2015-05-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-05-20AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2015-05-20AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-05-19SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2015-05-19SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2015-05-18SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 772.) To printer.
2015-05-18SenatePlaced on General File.
2015-05-18SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-04-15SenateExemption effective.
2015-04-15SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2015-04-14SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2015-04-14SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 344.)
2015-04-14SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-04-14SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-02-09SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2015-02-02SenateRead first time. To committee.
2014-12-22SenateFrom printer.
2014-12-20SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback