NV SB6 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 142.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public safety; replacing the term ex parte order with emergency order; making various changes relating to applications for and the issuance of orders for protection against high-risk behavior; revising the persons to whom an adverse party must surrender firearms; requiring a court to order the return of any surrendered firearm of an adverse party upon the expiration of an extended order for protection against high-risk behavior; revising provisions relating to the dissolution of orders for protection against high-risk behavior; eliminating the requirement for a court clerk or designee to provide assistance to certain persons relating to such orders; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing orders for protection against high-risk behavior. (BDR 3-394)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-28SenateChapter 142.
2021-05-27SenateApproved by the Governor.
2021-05-25SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2021-05-21SenateAssembly Amendment Nos. 598 concurred in. To enrollment.
2021-05-21SenateIn Senate.
2021-05-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 11, Excused: 1, Not voting: 1.) To Senate.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
2021-05-19AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 598.) To printer.
2021-05-19AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-05-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-04-20AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2021-04-20AssemblyIn Assembly.
2021-04-19SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.) To Assembly.
2021-04-19SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
2021-04-16SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 449.) To printer.
2021-04-16SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2021-04-15SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 348.) To printer.
2021-04-15SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-04-15SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-02-01SenateRead first time. To committee.
2020-12-14SenateFrom printer.
2020-11-18SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/7181/Overview
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/SB/SB6.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/SB/SB6_R1.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/SB/SB6_R2.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/SB/SB6_R3.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/SB/SB6_EN.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/Amendments/A_SB6_348.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/Amendments/A_SB6_R1_449.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/Amendments/A_SB6_R2_598.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/GetBillVoteMembers?voteKey=7201&voteResultPanel=All
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/GetBillVoteMembers?voteKey=7610&voteResultPanel=All

Bill Comments

feedback