NV SB55 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 488.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 488.
Summary
Makes various changes concerning commercial recordings. (BDR 7-413)
Title
Makes various changes concerning commercial recordings. (BDR 7-413)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-09 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 488. | |
2009-06-02 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-06-01 | To enrollment. | |
2009-06-01 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. | |
2009-06-01 | To printer. | |
2009-05-31 | Conference report adopted by Assembly. | |
2009-05-31 | Conference report adopted by Senate. | |
2009-05-31 | From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 588 and further amend. | |
2009-05-28 | Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee. | |
2009-05-28 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-28 | Assembly Amendment No. 588 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate. | |
2009-05-28 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | Assembly Amendment No. 588 not concurred in. To Assembly. | |
2009-05-21 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-21 | To Senate. | |
2009-05-21 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-20 | To printer. | |
2009-05-20 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) | |
2009-05-20 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-20 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2009-05-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 588.) | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-20 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-09 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2009-04-09 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-06 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-03 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-02 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 15.) To printer. | |
2009-04-01 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-12-08 | From printer. | |
2008-12-05 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=82 |