NV SB547 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 556.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to energy; excluding from regulation as a public utility certain plants or equipment used by a data center; revising provisions governing the applicability of certain assessments imposed by the Public Utilities Commission of Nevada; revising the information required to be included in the integrated resource plan filed by an electric utility with

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to providers of new electric resources. (BDR 58-913)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenateChapter 556.
2019-06-12SenateApproved by the Governor.
2019-06-07SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-06-03SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-06-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-06-03AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2019-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-06-02AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee.
2019-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-06-02SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly.
2019-06-02SenateTo printer.
2019-06-02SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
2019-06-02SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2019-06-02SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1089.)
2019-06-02SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-06-01SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1070.) To printer.
2019-06-01SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-06-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-05-17SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-05-16SenateWaiver granted effective: May 10, 2019.
2019-05-16SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback