NV SB547 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain large school districts to establish, through negotiations with an employee organization, a salary incentive program for professional growth. (BDR 34-1241)
Title
Requires certain large school districts to establish, through negotiations with an employee organization, a salary incentive program for professional growth. (BDR 34-1241)
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Ford [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1085.) To printer. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |