NV SB540 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 585.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs the Legislative Commission to authorize the construction or installation of a memorial to Nevada firefighters on the Capitol Complex. (BDR S-1221)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the Legislative Commission to authorize the construction or installation of a memorial to Nevada firefighters on the Capitol Complex. (BDR S-1221)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-14SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 585.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2017-06-04AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-04AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-06-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-05-30AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
2017-05-30AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-05-30SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-05-29SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 947.) To printer.
2017-05-29SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-05-29SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-05-19SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-05-18SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback