NV SB54 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 193.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 193.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing the use of the proceeds of a tax for infrastructure by certain smaller counties. (BDR 32-341)
Title
Revises provisions governing the use of the proceeds of a tax for infrastructure by certain smaller counties. (BDR 32-341)
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 193. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2017-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 93.) To printer. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2016-11-23 | Senate | From printer. |
2016-11-17 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer. |