NV SB534 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 471.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 471.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT making an appropriation from the State General Fund to the Department of Transportation for the replacement of the Nevada State Radio System; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes an appropriation from the State General Fund to the Department of Transportation for the replacement of the Nevada State Radio System. (BDR S-1168)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 471. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 946.) To printer. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |