NV SB53 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 279.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 279.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to mining; revising provisions governing the membership of the Mining Oversight and Accountability Commission; temporarily revising provisions governing the review of certain mining regulations by the Commission; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing the Mining Oversight and Accountability Commission. (BDR 46-218)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 279. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 748 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | To printer. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 9, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 748.) |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-21 | Senate | From printer. |
2018-11-19 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |