NV SB52 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 25.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 25.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to outdoor recreation; requiring the Administrator of the Division of Outdoor Recreation in the State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources to establish a program for awarding a dark sky designation to certain sites in this State; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Requires the establishment of a program for awarding a dark sky designation to certain sites in this State. (BDR 35-427)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 25. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) To Senate. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2020-12-15 | Senate | From printer. |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |