NV SB52 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 434.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 434.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing criminal procedure. (BDR 14-159)
Title
Revises provisions governing criminal procedure. (BDR 14-159)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 434. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | From printer. To enrollment. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | To printer. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Conference report adopted by Assembly. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Conference report adopted by Senate. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 751 and further amend. |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-05-29 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Assembly Amendment No. 751 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 751 not concurred in. To Assembly. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 1, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2015-05-15 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 751.) To printer. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | To committee. |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read second time. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2014-12-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2014-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |