NV SB517 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 464.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 464.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT making appropriations to the Nevada Highway Patrol for replacement of computer hardware and software and mobile data computers and for portable and mobile radio equipment; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes appropriations to the Nevada Highway Patrol for replacement of computer hardware and software and mobile data computers and for portable and mobile radio equipment. (BDR S-1224)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 464. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 987.) To printer. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |