NV SB516 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 595.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions governing workforce innovation and apprenticeships. (BDR 53-913)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing workforce innovation and apprenticeships. (BDR 53-913)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 595.
2017-06-01SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-05-30SenateAssembly Amendment No. 941 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-05-29SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
2017-05-25AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 941.) To printer.
2017-05-25AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-05-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2017-05-18AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-18SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
2017-05-17SenateTo printer.
2017-05-17SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
2017-05-17SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2017-05-17SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 711.)
2017-05-17SenatePlaced on General File.
2017-05-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-25SenateExemption effective.
2017-04-25SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-24SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2017-04-24SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 187.)
2017-04-24SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-04SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-29SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-27SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback