NV SB512 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 459.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 459.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Nevada Gaming Control Board; making appropriations to the Board for the costs of modernization of the technology system and replacement of security system equipment; extending the reversion date of the appropriation made by the 79th Session of the Nevada Legislature to the Board for certain in-state travel costs related to the Alpha Migration Project; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes appropriations to the Nevada Gaming Control Board for modernization of the technology system and replacement of security system equipment and extends the reversion date of a previous appropriation made to the Board for certain costs related to the Alpha Migration Project. (BDR S-1188)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 459. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 989.) To printer. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |