NV SB51 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the State Personnel System; authorizing the concurrent appointment of two employees to the same unclassified position for a temporary period in certain circumstances; removing a prohibition against an employee in the Executive Department taking annual leave during the first 6 months of employment; exempting certain officers and employees of the Nevada Gaming Control Board from the provisions governing the State Personnel System; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes regarding the State Personnel System. (BDR 23-183)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Senate(No further action taken.)
2019-04-18SenateExemption effective.
2019-04-18SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2019-04-17SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2019-04-17SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 227.)
2019-04-17SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-04SenateRead first time. To committee.
2018-11-21SenateFrom printer.
2018-11-19SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback