NV SB508 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 455.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 455.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT making an appropriation to the State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources for the replacement of information technology infrastructure and making an appropriation to the Interim Finance Committee for allocation to the Department for wildfire prevention, restoration and long-term planning; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes appropriations to the State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources for the replacement of information technology infrastructure and to the Interim Finance Committee for allocation to the Department for wildfire prevention, restoration and long-term planning. (BDR S-1178)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 455. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 1104 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | To printer. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Vacant: 1.) |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1104.) |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |