NV SB507 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 454.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 454.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT making an appropriation to the State Public Works Division of the Department of Administration for the support of the Marlette Lake Water System; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes an appropriation to the State Public Works Division of the Department of Administration for the support of the Marlette Lake Water System. (BDR S-1176)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 454. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1038.) To printer. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |