NV SB507 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the interim committee structure of the Legislature. (BDR 17-1126)
Title
Revises the interim committee structure of the Legislature. (BDR 17-1126)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 654.) To printer. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Notice of exemption. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |