NV SB507 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 433.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 433.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to economic development. (BDR 18-1204)
Title
Revises provisions relating to economic development. (BDR 18-1204)
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 433. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2015-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 11, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2015-05-29 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read second time. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer. |