NV SB504 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 115.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 115.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amends provisions relating to a safe and respectful learning environment in public schools. (BDR 34-1201)
Title
Amends provisions relating to a safe and respectful learning environment in public schools. (BDR 34-1201)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 115. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 6.) To Senate. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 1, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 353.) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |