NV SB5 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 8.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 8.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing the selection and summoning of grand jurors in certain counties. (BDR 1-319)
Title
Revises provisions governing the selection and summoning of grand jurors in certain counties. (BDR 1-319)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 8. | |
2011-03-24 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-03-22 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2011-03-21 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2011-03-18 | Read second time. | |
2011-03-17 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-02-11 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2011-02-11 | In Assembly. | |
2011-02-10 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-02-09 | Read second time. | |
2011-02-08 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-02-07 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2010-12-16 | From printer. | |
2010-12-13 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |