NV SB497 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 530.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the Advisory Task Force on School Leader Management. (BDR S-332)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the Advisory Task Force on School Leader Management. (BDR S-332)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 530.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 6.) To Senate.
2017-06-04AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-04AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-06-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-05-25AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
2017-05-25AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-25SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on General File.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended.
2017-04-25SenateExemption effective.
2017-04-25SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-24SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2017-04-24SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 513.)
2017-04-24SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-04SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-29SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-27SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback