NV SB495 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 332. (Effective June 12, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT making appropriations to and authorizing the expenditure of money by the Division of Child and Family Services of the Department of Health and Human Services for the replacement of computer hardware and associated software, equipment and vehicles and for deferred maintenance projects; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes appropriations to and authorizes the expenditure of money by the Division of Child and Family Services of the Department of Health and Human Services for the replacement of computer hardware and associated software, equipment and vehicles and for deferred maintenance projects. (BDR S-1186)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-12SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 332. (Effective June 12, 2023)
2023-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2023-06-05SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2023-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2023-06-04AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-06-04AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2023-06-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2023-05-31AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
2023-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly.
2023-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2023-05-31SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2023-05-30SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 794.) To printer.
2023-05-30SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2023-05-30SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2023-05-12SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2023-05-11SenateExemption effective.
2023-05-11SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback