NV SB495 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to small businesses; creating the Office of the Small Business Advocate within the Office of the Lieutenant Governor; authorizing the Lieutenant Governor to employ and appoint personnel to the Office of the Small Business Advocate; requiring the Office of the Small Business Advocate to coordinate with state agencies and local governments under certain circumstances; authorizing the Office of the Small Business Advocate to review certain requests for assistance related to small businesses; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Creates the Office of the Small Business Advocate. (BDR 18-136)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Assembly. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | To printer. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1108.) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |