NV SB491 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Chapter 371. (Effective June 12, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Department of Business and Industry; extending the date of reversion of the appropriation made by the 81st Session of the Nevada Legislature to the Real Estate Division of the Department for an update of its licensing software system; making appropriations; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions related to the Department of Business and Industry concerning information technology. (BDR S-1167)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-29 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-13SenateChapter 371. (Effective June 12, 2023)
2023-06-12SenateApproved by the Governor.
2023-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2023-06-05SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2023-06-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2023-06-03AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-06-02AssemblyRead second time.
2023-06-01AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File for next legislative day.
2023-06-01AssemblyTaken from Second Reading File.
2023-06-01AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2023-06-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2023-05-30AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
2023-05-30AssemblyIn Assembly.
2023-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2023-05-27SenateRead second time.
2023-05-27SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2023-05-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2023-05-12SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2023-05-11SenateExemption effective.
2023-05-11SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback